Global Patent Index - EP 1161896 A1

EP 1161896 A1 2001-12-12 - Device for applying a product on keratinous fibres, in particular eyelashes or eyebrows

Title (en)

Device for applying a product on keratinous fibres, in particular eyelashes or eyebrows

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Auftragen eines Produktes auf keratinischen Fasern, insbesondere auf Wimpern oder Augenbrauen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'application d'un produit sur les fibres kératiniques, notamment sur les cils ou les sourcils

Publication

EP 1161896 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01401274 A

Priority

FR 0007443 A

Abstract (en)

An applicator (1), consists of a support (2) made from a first material and a holder (12) for the application elements (10), such as teeth or bristles, made from a second, less-rigid material and able to pivot relative to the support. The first material has a flexure modulus of 1000 or more, and the second less than 1000, and the two can be connected by over-mouldings or bi-injection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/26; A46B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/04 (2006.01); A45D 19/02 (2006.01); A45D 40/26 (2006.01); A46B 3/04 (2006.01); A46B 9/02 (2006.01); A46D 3/00 (2006.01); A46B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/00 (2013.01); A45D 40/265 (2013.01); A46B 3/04 (2013.01); A46B 9/021 (2013.01); A46B 15/0059 (2013.01); A46D 1/0238 (2013.01); A46D 1/0253 (2013.01); A46D 3/005 (2013.01); A46B 15/0055 (2013.01); A46B 2200/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1161896 A1 20011212; CA 2349702 A1 20011209; CA 2349702 C 20061017; CN 1198530 C 20050427; CN 1328798 A 20020102; FR 2809938 A1 20011214; FR 2809938 B1 20020906; JP 2002051831 A 20020219; JP 3776753 B2 20060517; US 2002023657 A1 20020228; US 6681777 B2 20040127

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090325

2008-07-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR APPLYING A PRODUCT ON KERATINOUS FIBRES, IN PARTICULAR EYELASHES OR EYEBROWS

2007-11-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR APPLYING A PRODUCT ON KERATINOUS FIBRES, IN PARTICULAR EYELASHES OR EYEBROWS ??2001/29

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041005

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020612

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI