Global Patent Index - EP 1161898 A1

EP 1161898 A1 2001-12-12 - Fast joint used to fix the lateral sides of drawers to the front wooden panel

Title (en)

Fast joint used to fix the lateral sides of drawers to the front wooden panel

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur schnellen Befestigung einer hölzernen Frontblende an Schubladenzargen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour fixer rapidement le panneau avant en bois sur les parois latérales d'un tiroir

Publication

EP 1161898 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01830364 A

Priority

IT MC20000050 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a fast joint used to fix the front wooden panel of drawers to the two lateral sides that are made of extruded plastic or aluminium profiles. Apart from ensuring fast coupling and uncoupling, the joint according to the present invention also allows for adjusting the front panel with respect to the lateral sides. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/956 (2017.01); A47B 2210/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1161898 A1 20011212; EP 1161898 B1 20060809; DE 60122054 D1 20060921; IT 1316094 B1 20030328; IT MC20000050 A1 20011206

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100604

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2006-11-10 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061110

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60122054 P 20060921

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2006-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMPAGNUCCI - S.P.A.

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020513

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI