Global Patent Index - EP 1161906 A2

EP 1161906 A2 2001-12-12 - Seating furniture convertible into lying furniture

Title (en)

Seating furniture convertible into lying furniture

Title (de)

In ein Liegemöbel umwandelbares Sitzmöbel

Title (fr)

Meuble d'assise transformable en meuble de couchage

Publication

EP 1161906 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01890169 A

Priority

AT 4172000 U

Abstract (en)

The sofabed has a back rest (3) which tilts forward into the space formed by sliding forward the seat cushion (2). Levers (4) are attached at the top to either side of the back rest and are pivoted at the bottom on the frame (1). They can swivel between two stops (5, 6) and a third stop (7) on the lever defines the position of the back rest when raised. A chain or cable (9) attached to the backrest and a mounting on the frame keeps it horizontal when lowered.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem in ein Liegemöbel umwandelbaren Sitzmöbel, ist in einem Möbelgestell (1) mindestens ein Sitzpolster (2) vorziehbar geführt. Ein verschwenkbarer Rückenpolster (3) verschließt in der Liegeposition den frei gewordenen Raum zwischen der Rückwand des Möbelgestelles (1) umd dem Sitzpolster (2). Um die Liegefläche vergrößern zu können, wird der Rückenpolster (3) beim Verschwenken in die Liegeposition in Richtung des vorgezogenen Sitzpolsters (2) vorgeschoben und ist weiters die, die Liegeauflage bildende Rückseite des Rückenpolsters (3) bis zur Rückwand des Möbelgestelles (1) verlängert. Erreicht wird dies dadurch, dass an beiden Seiten des verschwenkbaren Rückenpolsters (3) ein Ende eines Hebels (4) angelenkt ist, der mit seinem entgegengesetzten Ende im Seitenbereich des Möbelgestelles (1) gelagert ist, und dass mechanische Bauteile (8) vorgesehen sind, die in Liegeposition des Rückenpolsters (3) diesen in einer annähernd waagrechten Lage positionieren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/165 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/1655 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1161906 A2 20011212; EP 1161906 A3 20021211; AT 4156 U1 20010326

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031128

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 17/16 A, 7A 47C 17/20 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI