Global Patent Index - EP 1161908 A1

EP 1161908 A1 2001-12-12 - Stand with adjustable underframe

Title (en)

Stand with adjustable underframe

Title (de)

Stand mit verstellbarem Untergestell

Title (fr)

Etal à piétement réglable

Publication

EP 1161908 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01420127 A

Priority

FR 0007589 A

Abstract (en)

The stall for displaying merchandise has a display surface which is mounted on a plate (16) and on which it can turn., its degree of rotation being limited by pegs on the plate which move in a curved slot in the surface. The plate is mounted on a pivot (17) on a base (2) and its inclination adjusted using a frame (21) with holes along its length which slides in a guide (24) and is locked in position by a pin (29).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1161908 A1 20011212; FR 2809943 A1 20011214; FR 2809943 B1 20041105

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040112

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020530

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI