Global Patent Index - EP 1161916 A2

EP 1161916 A2 2001-12-12 - Household apparatus using water and method adjusting the hardness of a fresh water quantity

Title (en)

Household apparatus using water and method adjusting the hardness of a fresh water quantity

Title (de)

Wasserführendes Haushaltsgerät und Verfahren zum Einstellen des Härtegrades einer Frischwassermenge

Title (fr)

Appareil domestique utilsant de l'eau et procédé pour ajuster la dureté d'une quantité d'eau fraiche

Publication

EP 1161916 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01106288 A

Priority

DE 10028770 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a working container (2) and a device (14) for softening fresh water arranged in a water feed device for delivering fresh water. An adjustable divider (39) arranged in the water feed device divides the input water into at least two sub-water quantities, especially flows, whereby a first part is fed to the water softener and then to the working container and the second part is fed directly to the working container. Independent claims are also included for the following: a method off setting the degree of hardness of the freshwater to be fed to the working container of a water-suing machine.

Abstract (de)

Ein wasserführendes Haushaltsgerät, insbesondere eine Haushalt-Geschirrspülmaschine, weist eine Arbeitsbehälter (2) und eine innerhalb einer für die Zufuhr von Frischwasser vorgesehenen Wasserzulaufeinrichtung angeordneten Einrichtung (14) zum Enthärten des Frischwassers auf. Erfindungsgemäß ist in der Wasserzulaufeinrichtung eine einstellbare Teilvorrichtung (39) angeordnet, durch die die zulaufende Wassermenge in wenigstens zwei Teilmengen aufteilbar ist. Ein erster Teil der zulaufenden Wassermenge ist zuerst der Enthärtereinrichtung (14) und anschließend dem Arbeitsbehälter (2) und ein zweiter Teil direkt dem Arbeitsbehälter (2) zuführbar. Auf diese Weise hat die Flüssigkeit im Arbeitsbehälter (2) eine definierte Resthärte, die weder zu einer Trübung von zu spülenden Glasspülgutteilen noch zu Kalkrückständen auf dem Spülgut führt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4229 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1161916 A2 20011212; EP 1161916 A3 20020925; DE 10028770 A1 20011213

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47L 15/42 A, 7D 06F 39/00 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI