Global Patent Index - EP 1161917 A2

EP 1161917 A2 2001-12-12 - Dishwater with height adjustable rack

Title (en)

Dishwater with height adjustable rack

Title (de)

Geschirrspülmaschine mit einem in der Höhe einstellbaren Geschirrkorb

Title (fr)

Lave-vaisselle avec panier réglable en hauteur

Publication

EP 1161917 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01201906 A

Priority

IT MI20001246 A

Abstract (en)

A dishwasher (1) is described comprising a washing tank (2) housing at least one rack (3) sliding along lateral guides (4) of the tank to which said rack (3) is connected by means of sliding means (101, 102) provided with adjustment means (7) that are suitable to selectively vary the vertical position of said rack. The adjustment means (7) for the height of the rack comprise at least a first vertically displaceable element (8) associated with the rack (3), at least one second element (6) associated with the sliding means (101, 102) and at least one third revolving element (13) that can rotate in a single sense, said second element (6) co-operating with said first element (8) so that by applying an upward force to the rack (3) an upper position and a lower position are defined between which said rack (3) can be moved, said third revolving element (13) being in locking engagement with said second element (6) when in said lower and upper positions of the rack (3) and in locking engagement with said first element (8) when in said upper position of the rack (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/504 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1161917 A2 20011212; EP 1161917 A3 20030108; EP 1161917 B1 20060614; DE 60120559 D1 20060727; DE 60120559 T2 20070531; IT 1317804 B1 20030715; IT MI20001246 A1 20011205; IT MI20001246 D0 20000605

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60120559

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130521

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120730

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60120559

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2007-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070315

2006-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60120559 P 20060727

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2006-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060614

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050314

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI