Global Patent Index - EP 1161929 A2

EP 1161929 A2 2001-12-12 - Hydraulic system for a table, particularly an operating table, including a plurality of hydraulic actuators

Title (en)

Hydraulic system for a table, particularly an operating table, including a plurality of hydraulic actuators

Title (de)

Hydrauliksystem für einen mehrere hydraulische Verbraucher aufweisenden Tisch oder dgl., insbesondere Operationstisch

Title (fr)

Système hydraulique pour une table, en particulier table d'opération, comprenant plusieurs consommateurs hydrauliques

Publication

EP 1161929 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112348 A

Priority

DE 10028652 A

Abstract (en)

A lower part of an operating table has a moving mechanism framework (1) with moving rollers (2). This framework has a table support (3) fitted with a height-adjustable cover plate (4), onto which an operating table upper part can be fitted. Several hydraulic consumers provide adjustment. A reversing lever (22) selects the position of a sliding valve. A connector rod (24) links the reversing lever to a piston rod in the sliding valve.

Abstract (de)

Mit einem Hydrauliksystem mit wenigstens einer Pumpe, welche über Ventile den Verbrauchern wahlweise einen Förderstrom aus einem Tank zur Verfügung stellt, soll eine Lösung geschaffen werden, mit der mehrere hydraulische Verbraucher aufweisende Tische, insbesondere Operationstische, auch bei Defekten im elektrischen bzw. elektronischen System sicher betätigt werden können, wobei im defektfreien Normalbetrieb eine komfortable Bedienung gewährleistet sein soll. Dies wird dadurch erreicht, dass zwischen dem Tank und den Verbrauchern ein erster Förderweg mit einer elektrisch betätigten Pumpe und elektrisch betätigten Ventilen und ein getrennter zweiter Förderweg mit einer Fußpumpe und mit mechanischen Ventilen vorgesehen ist, wobei zwischen den Verbrauchern und den elektrisch betätigten Ventilen bzw. den mechanischen Ventilen Umschaltventile angeordnet sind, derart, dass der Förderstrom zum jeweiligen Verbraucher entweder von der elektrisch betätigten Pumpe oder der Fußpumpe bereitgestellt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 13/02; F15B 11/17; F15B 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 13/02 (2006.01); F15B 13/10 (2006.01); F15B 20/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/10 (2013.01); A61G 13/02 (2013.01); F15B 20/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1161929 A2 20011212; EP 1161929 A3 20040407; EP 1161929 B1 20060517; DE 10028652 C1 20020228; DE 50109785 D1 20060622; PL 347880 A1 20011217

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070220

2006-12-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-08-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060828

2006-06-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50109785 P 20060622

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-05-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2005-12-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61G 13/02 A

2005-12-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 15B 13/10 B

2005-12-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 15B 11/17 B

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040423

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61G 13/02 A

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 15B 13/10 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI