Global Patent Index - EP 1161973 A2

EP 1161973 A2 2001-12-12 - Billiard cue

Title (en)

Billiard cue

Title (de)

Billardstock

Title (fr)

Queue de billard

Publication

EP 1161973 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01111368 A

Priority

JP 2000173898 A

Abstract (en)

A billiard cue comprises of a shaft portion and a bat portion which is coupled to the shaft portion. Both the shaft portion and/or the bat portion is shaped into a bar body in which a space is formed. The space is formed along a longitude of the bar body and has a cylindrical shape. The space may have a truncated cone shape. In addition, the space may be partially formed in the bar body. Furthermore, the space may have plural cylindrical space sections which are arranged along the longitude of the bar body. The cylindrical space sections have diameters which are different from one another. Bumps are positioned between the cylindrical space sections, respectively. Inasmuch as the shaft portion and/or the bat portion have the spaces, respectively, it is possible to make the billiard cue lighter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63D 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63D 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63D 15/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H11251799 A 19990917 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1161973 A2 20011212; EP 1161973 A3 20030402; CN 1332026 A 20020123; JP 2001346932 A 20011218; TW I235080 B 20050701; US 2001051547 A1 20011213

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031003

2004-02-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI