Global Patent Index - EP 1162005 A2

EP 1162005 A2 2001-12-12 - Slat sorting arrangement

Title (en)

Slat sorting arrangement

Title (de)

Sortiervorrichtung für Lamellen

Title (fr)

Installation de tri de lamelles

Publication

EP 1162005 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01111593 A

Priority

DE 10028918 A

Abstract (en)

Parquet wooden blocks waiting to be graded are lifted up off a conveyor line (3) and passed over to an outward transfer line (5) fitted above the conveyor line. A controllable scanning device transmits an impulse directed upwards onto the parquet wooden blocks waiting to be graded. Five CCD cameras form a camera station to monitor conveyor belts (12-13).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Sortiervorrichtung für Lamellen, insbesondere für Parkettlamellen aus Holz vorgeschlagen, die eine Ausschleusstelle in einer horizontal verlaufenden Transportstrecke und eine von der Ausschleusstelle ausgehende Ausschleusstrecke aufweist. Die auszusortierenden Lamellen werden nach oben von der Transportstrecke abgehoben und auf die oberhalb der Transportstrecke angeordnete Ausschleusstrecke übergeben, indem eine ansteuerbare Ablenkeinrichtung einen nach oben gerichteten Impuls auf die auszusortierenden Lamellen überträgt. Zur Unterstützung einer definierten Übergabe der aussortierten Lamellen auf die Ausschleusstrecke kann ein oberhalb der Ausschleusstelle angeordnetes Führungselement vorhanden sein, welches vorzugsweise als Saugbandförderer mit Beschleunigungseffekt für die Lamellen ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 5/36; B07C 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/60 (2006.01); B07C 5/14 (2006.01); B07C 5/34 (2006.01); B07C 5/342 (2006.01); B07C 5/36 (2006.01); B65G 47/68 (2006.01); B65G 47/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/14 (2013.01); B07C 5/3422 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162005 A2 20011212; EP 1162005 A3 20040908; CN 1189252 C 20050216; CN 1328884 A 20020102; CZ 20012012 A3 20020116; DE 10028918 A1 20011220; JP 2002052367 A 20020219; PL 347963 A1 20011217; US 2002027058 A1 20020307; US 6575288 B2 20030610

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-05-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-05-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050107

- Countries: SI

2005-03-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050107

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI