Global Patent Index - EP 1162009 A2

EP 1162009 A2 2001-12-12 - Die-holder/tray assembly with anti-rotation means for die-forming machines

Title (en)

Die-holder/tray assembly with anti-rotation means for die-forming machines

Title (de)

Matrizenhalteranordnung mit Anti-Drehbewegungsmitteln in Gesenkformvorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Ensemble de porte-matrice avec moyens anti-rotation pour machines d'estampage

Publication

EP 1162009 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01202014 A

Priority

IT MI20001305 A

Abstract (en)

Die-holder (10,11,12)/tray (40) assembly for the die-forming of materials such as steel and the like, comprising first means (20,43;220,43;320,43;420,43) for relative positioning and locking of the tray (40) with respect to the die-holder (10,11,12) and second means (30,42;230,42;330,42;430,42) for constraining the relative rotation/rotary translation of the tray (40) with respect to the die-holder. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 37/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 37/14 (2006.01); B21J 13/00 (2006.01); B21J 13/03 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C08B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 13/03 (2013.01); B21D 37/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162009 A2 20011212; EP 1162009 A3 20030521; EP 1162009 B1 20081029; AT 412478 T 20081115; CZ 20012010 A3 20020515; CZ 303237 B6 20120613; DE 60136310 D1 20081211; ES 2313926 T3 20090316; HU 0102386 A2 20020128; HU 0102386 A3 20030728; HU 0102386 D0 20010828; HU 226155 B1 20080528; IT 1317810 B1 20030715; IT MI20001305 A1 20011210; IT MI20001305 D0 20000609; PL 199270 B1 20080930; PL 347997 A1 20011217; PT 1162009 E 20081126; SI 1162009 T1 20090430

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180516

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180509

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180516

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180611

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20180528

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180508

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170517

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081029

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090130

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090528

2009-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-10-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090730

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081029

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081029

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081029

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081029

2009-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2313926 T3

2009-02-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60136310 P 20081211

2008-12-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-11-26 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20081114

2008-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2008-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-10-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: MK RO SI

2008-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041207

2004-02-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031113

- Countries: MK

2004-02-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031113

- Countries: RO

2004-02-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031113

- Countries: SI

2004-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21D 37/14 A

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21D 37/04 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI