Global Patent Index - EP 1162010 A2

EP 1162010 A2 2001-12-12 - Apparatus for mounting stamped at delivered parts

Title (en)

Apparatus for mounting stamped at delivered parts

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Montage von Stanzteilen mit Zuführteilen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour montage des pieces decoupees avec des pieces amenees

Publication

EP 1162010 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01109898 A

Priority

DE 10028366 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a slide with a detachable die, moving between advanced and retracted positions. The die (10) is indirectly connected to the slide (4) via locking devices (12), which during an overload are disengaged against a return force (11). Relative positions of slide and die when engaged are monitored by a sensor (17), and with disengaged locking devices the sensor interrupts the assembly process and stops production.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung zur Montage von innerhalb eines Stanzwerkzeuges zusammengeführten Stanzteilen mit Zuführteilen, gegebenenfalls weiteren Stanzteilen, mittels eines an einem Schieber lösbar befestigten Stempels angegeben, wobei der Schieber am Gehäuseteil zwischen einer vorgeschobenen und einer zurückgezogenen Position in Richtung der Montage hin- und herbewegbar ist. Dabei ist vorgesehen, dass der Stempel mit dem Schieber wenigstens mittelbar über formschlüssige, bei Überlastung gegen eine Rückstellkraft außer Eingriff gelangende Rastmittel verbunden ist, und dass die dem Eingriffszustand der Rastmittel entsprechende gegenseitige Relativposition von Stempel und Schieber durch einen Sensor abfühlbar ist, der bei außer Eingriff befindlichen Rastmitteln den Montageablauf unterbricht und dadurch die gesamte Produktion stillsetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/00; B21D 28/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/00 (2006.01); B21D 43/02 (2006.01); B21D 55/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 55/00 (2013.01); B21D 28/00 (2013.01); B21D 43/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162010 A2 20011212; EP 1162010 A3 20030122; DE 10028366 A1 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-11-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21D 39/00 A, 7B 21D 28/00 B, 7B 21D 55/00 B, 7B 21D 43/02 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI