Global Patent Index - EP 1162012 A1

EP 1162012 A1 2001-12-12 - Hydraulic swaging tool

Title (en)

Hydraulic swaging tool

Title (de)

Hydraulisches Quetschwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil de sertissage hydraulique

Publication

EP 1162012 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01113982 A

Priority

US 59127600 A

Abstract (en)

A swaging tool includes a generally tubular housing (12) having a first end portion (22) including a port (24) for providing pressurized fluid, a second end portion (26) defining a closed cylinder and an intermediate portion therebetween that includes an elongated aperture (44) through an outer surface of the housing (12). A single piece piston (14) is movably located within the housing (12) and axially extends through the intermediate housing portion such that at least a portion of the piston (14) is visible through the aperture (44). A fixed jaw unit (18) is located on the second end portion of the housing and a movable jaw unit (20) is removably engageable directly to the piston (14) through the aperture (44) in the radial direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/04; B25B 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2006.01); B25B 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/10 (2013.01); B21D 39/046 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5367 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162012 A1 20011212; EP 1162012 B1 20040218; DE 60102034 D1 20040325; DE 60102034 T2 20041021; ES 2214363 T3 20040916; US 6430792 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150609

2016-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160728

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150608

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150608

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150608

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60102034

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140623

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140623

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-03-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2214363 T3

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60102034 P 20040325

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021018

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020611

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI