Global Patent Index - EP 1162014 A2

EP 1162014 A2 2001-12-12 - Pressure controlled fluid pressure extrusion method

Title (en)

Pressure controlled fluid pressure extrusion method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum druckgesteuerten, hydraulischen Druckstrangpressen

Title (fr)

Procédé d'extrusion par pression hydraulique à pression controlée

Publication

EP 1162014 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01304835 A

Priority

JP 2000173006 A

Abstract (en)

The lower part of a material blank to be molded forms a lower seal (9) with a die (2). A punch (3) applying a molding force to the material forms an upper seal (7) with the perimeter of the die. The space between the upper and lower seals (9) forms a pressure chamber (6) that is filled with a fluid. As the punch descends into the die, the fluid is pressurized. The lower seal (9) is a complete seal to prevent leakage of fluid into the die. The upper seal is given a clearance with the die that permits controlled leakage of fluid therepast at a rate that limits the maximum pressure in the pressure chamber while permitting the development of an adequate pressure on the material being molded. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 5/12; B21C 23/00; B21J 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 5/06 (2006.01); B21C 23/00 (2006.01); B21C 23/10 (2006.01); B21J 3/00 (2006.01); B21J 5/04 (2006.01); B21J 5/12 (2006.01); B21K 1/12 (2006.01); B21K 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 5/12 (2013.01); B21C 23/007 (2013.01); B21C 23/10 (2013.01); B21J 5/04 (2013.01); B21K 1/066 (2013.01); B21K 1/12 (2013.01); B21K 1/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162014 A2 20011212; EP 1162014 A3 20020724; EP 1162014 B1 20050323; CA 2343685 A1 20011209; CA 2343685 C 20060704; DE 60109519 D1 20050428; DE 60109519 T2 20060413; JP 2001347336 A 20011218; JP 3707768 B2 20051019; US 2001049955 A1 20011213

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60109519

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140609

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140613

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140528

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051227

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60109519 P 20050428

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-03-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KANAMARU, HISANOBU

2004-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOBAYASHI, KAZUTO

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021003

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21J 5/12 A, 7B 21J 5/04 B, 7B 21C 23/00 B, 7B 21C 23/10 B, 7B 21K 1/12 B, 7B 21K 1/30 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI