Global Patent Index - EP 1162016 A1

EP 1162016 A1 2001-12-12 - Apparatus for casting a directionally solidified article

Title (en)

Apparatus for casting a directionally solidified article

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Giessen eines gerichtet erstarrten Giesskörpers

Title (fr)

Appareil pour la coulée d'une pièce solidifiée directionellement

Publication

EP 1162016 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00110334 A

Priority

EP 00110334 A

Abstract (en)

It is disclosed a casting furnace (1) for producing a single crystal or a directionally solidified article comprising an upper heating chamber (2), a lower cooling chamber (3), the cooling chamber (3) consisting of an upper portion (3b), a bottom portion (3c), walls (3d) and a bottom plate (3d), and a shell mould (5) to be moved from the heating to the cooling chamber (2,3) during the casting of the article. The cooling chamber (2) is formed with the bottom portion (3c) of the cooling chamber (3) having a greater base than the upper portion (3b) of the cooling chamber (3). This could be done as truncated cone or with curved walls. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 27/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162016 A1 20011212; EP 1162016 B1 20040721

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170824 AND 20170830

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): GB

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2002-10-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: GB

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): GB

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI