Global Patent Index - EP 1162032 B1

EP 1162032 B1 2007-10-24 - Portable power tool, especially concrete grinder

Title (en)

Portable power tool, especially concrete grinder

Title (de)

Handwerkzeugmaschine, insbesondere Betonschleifer

Title (fr)

Outil motorisé portatif, en particulier meuleuse pour béton

Publication

EP 1162032 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01111818 A

Priority

DE 10028128 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1162032A2] A motorized tool (34) treats the surface of a piece to be worked on. A hood guard (40) encases the tool and supports a flexible sealer element (42) for applying the hood guard to the surface to be treated and sealed. The sealer element takes the form of a sealing brush (43) and is held in a springy fashion on the hood guard by one or more flexible elements.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/04 (2006.01); B24B 55/05 (2006.01); B24B 23/02 (2006.01); B24B 55/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 55/052 (2013.01); B24B 23/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162032 A2 20011212; EP 1162032 A3 20031022; EP 1162032 B1 20071024; DE 10028128 A1 20011213; DE 50113160 D1 20071206; JP 2002018693 A 20020122

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50113160

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110516

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110516

2011-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100608

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080206

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113160 P 20071206

2007-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060717

2004-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040422

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24B 55/05 A

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24B 23/02 B

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24B 55/10 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI