Global Patent Index - EP 1162033 A1

EP 1162033 A1 2001-12-12 - Edge grinding method and apparatus

Title (en)

Edge grinding method and apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schleifen der Kanten von plattenförmigen Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour meuler les bords

Publication

EP 1162033 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01111480 A

Priority

DE 10027303 A

Abstract (en)

An impeller wheel (11) accelerates the flow of a coolant so that the outgoing speed of the coolant matches the surface speed of a grinding/polishing disk (10) or generates an approximate match. A dish-shaped guiding element (14) distributes the coolant onto the edge area of the grinding/polishing disk.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren bei dem plattenförmige Werkstücke, beispielsweise Glasscheiben für Kraftfahrzeuge mittels einer Schleifscheibe geschliffen und die Schleifstelle mittels eines Kühlmittels gekühlt wird soll so verbessert werden, dass die Umfangsgeschwindigkeit der Schleifscheibe 80 bis 100 Meter pro Sekunde betragen kann. Erfindungsgemäß wird der Kühlmittelstrom mittels eines Flügelrades (11) beschleunigt, sodass die Austrittsgeschwindigkeit des Kühlmittels mit der Umfangsgeschwindigkeit der Schleifscheibe (10) übereinstimmt oder annähernd übereinstimmt. Durch ein wannenförmiges Leitelement (14) wird das Kühlmittel auf den Randbereich der Schleifscheibe (10) verteilt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 57/02; B24B 9/10; B24D 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/10 (2006.01); B24B 57/02 (2006.01); B24D 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 57/02 (2013.01); B24B 9/10 (2013.01); B24D 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162033 A1 20011212; EP 1162033 B1 20050928; DE 10027303 A1 20011220; DE 50107541 D1 20060209

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100511

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100511

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090518

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50107541 P 20060209

2005-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2005-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR IT LI

2005-09-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BENTELER MASCHINENBAU GMBH

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040616

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FI FR IT LI

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020419

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR IT LI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI