Global Patent Index - EP 1162036 A2

EP 1162036 A2 2001-12-12 - Fastener driving tool for fasteners

Title (en)

Fastener driving tool for fasteners

Title (de)

Setzwerkzeug für Befestigungselemente

Title (fr)

Outil de pose de moyens de fixation

Publication

EP 1162036 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01810509 A

Priority

DE 10028012 A

Abstract (en)

The tool (2) has a conical outer shape(3) on the load-application side end of the plug's shaft (1) fitting into a conical recess (4). The conical recess and conical outer shape have a cone angle of ten degrees and are at least partly profiled.

Abstract (de)

Eine Einrichtung zur Vorschub- und/oder Drehmomentübertragung auf Ankerstangen (1) von Dübeln, insbesondere Verbunddübel, weist ein Setzwerkzeug (2) und eine Ankerstange (1) auf. Ein Ende des Setzwerkzeuges (2) weist eine konische, längs des Setzwerkzeuges (2) verlaufende Ausnehmung (4) auf, in die eine am lastangriffseitigen Ende der Ankerstange (1) angeordnete konische Aussenkontur einführbar ist. Die erfindungsgemässe Grösse der Steigung der beiden Konuswinkel (α, β) verbessert die Vorschub- und/oder Drehmomentübertragung auf Ankerstangen (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 31/00; B25B 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 20/00 (2006.01); B25B 13/06 (2006.01); B25B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 31/00 (2013.01); B25B 13/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162036 A2 20011212; EP 1162036 A3 20020911; EP 1162036 B1 20090930; AT 444142 T 20091015; DE 10028012 A1 20011213; DE 50115127 D1 20091112; JP 2002030900 A 20020131; JP 4795566 B2 20111019

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-12-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-11-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50115127 P 20091112

2009-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI SE

2009-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080124

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI SE

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 25B 31/00 A, 7B 25B 13/06 B, 7B 25D 17/00 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI