Global Patent Index - EP 1162040 A1

EP 1162040 A1 2001-12-12 - Folding knife with lockable blade

Title (en)

Folding knife with lockable blade

Title (de)

Klappmesser mit arretierbarer Klinge

Title (fr)

Couteau pliant avec lame verrouillable

Publication

EP 1162040 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01104007 A

Priority

DE 20009874 U

Abstract (en)

The blade for a clasp knife has a hole (5) formed as a curved slot extending through the blade. The curved slot has notch (6) to hold the blade in position. The curved slot extends around a pivot pin hole (3) in the blade.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Klinge für ein Klappmesser mit wenigstens einem Loch (5), welches durch die Klinge (1) hindurchführt, wobei der Rand des Loches (5) wenigstens eine dellenförmige oder nasenförmige Ausnehmung (6) aufweist oder bei der das Loch mit der nasenförmigen oder dellenförmigen Ausnehmung ein Langloch ist. Die Klinge ist arretierbar und kann dennoch einfach und kostengünstig hergestellt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 1/048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20009874 U1 20000921; EP 1162040 A1 20011212; US 2001052187 A1 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020521

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI