Global Patent Index - EP 1162047 A1

EP 1162047 A1 2001-12-12 - An apparatus for distributing powders on a support in a predefined pattern

Title (en)

An apparatus for distributing powders on a support in a predefined pattern

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verteilen von pülverförmigen Materialen in einem vorherbestimmten Muster auf einen Träger

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour distribuer suivant un dessin déterminé des matériaux pulvérulents sur un support

Publication

EP 1162047 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00202044 A

Priority

EP 00202044 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus for distributing powders on a support (2) in a predefined pattern comprises: a conveyor belt (1) for transporting the support (2); an applicator head (3) for applying the powders, located above the conveyor belt (1), which head (3) comprises a belt (4) exhibiting a plurality of perforations set out according to a predefined pattern and being of such dimensions as to allow passage of determined quantities of the powders; means for controlled supply of the powders to the head (3). The motion of the perforated belt (4) is correlated with a motion of the conveyor belt bearing and supplying the support (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 11/04; B28B 11/00; B05C 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/04 (2006.01); B05C 19/04 (2006.01); B28B 11/00 (2006.01); B28B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/048 (2013.01); B05B 12/32 (2018.02); B05C 19/04 (2013.01); B28B 11/001 (2013.01); B28B 11/044 (2013.01); B28B 11/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162047 A1 20011212; EP 1162047 B1 20040929; DE 60014336 D1 20041104; DE 60014336 T2 20051013; ES 2225017 T3 20050316; PT 1162047 E 20041231

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120609

2013-10-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131030

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60014336

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121210

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120608

2012-12-18 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20121210

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110606

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110602

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110609

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090608

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090608

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080611

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225017 T3

2004-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60014336 P 20041104

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYSTEM S.P.A.

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT PT

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020430

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI