Global Patent Index - EP 1162066 A1

EP 1162066 A1 2001-12-12 - Inking cup for pad printing

Title (en)

Inking cup for pad printing

Title (de)

Tampondruck-Farbbecher

Title (fr)

Réservoir d'encre pour une machine d'impression au tampon

Publication

EP 1162066 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01108548 A

Priority

DE 10028551 A

Abstract (en)

The printer ink cup has a magnet (10) which is height adjustable with respect to the scraper edge (22) on the lower face of the cup periphery. Height adjustment of the magnet varies the magnetic force in the plane of the scraper. The annular magnet can be mounted in a holding ring (8) with its upper side (16) positioned facing upwardly or downwardly to allow adjustment of the effective height of the magnet. There can be spacer rings between the supports on the cup and the magnet holder ring.

Abstract (de)

Tampondruck-Farbbecher mit mindestens einem Magneten (10). Der mindestens eine Magnet (10) ist relativ zur Rakelkantenebene, in welcher sich die Rakelkante (22) erstreckt, auf verschiedenen Höhenabständen positionierbar ausgebildet ist, wobei die in der Rakelkantenebene wirksame Magnetkraft je nach Höhenabstand unterschiedlich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 17/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] EP 0945266 A1 19990929 - HO WANG MAN [HK]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162066 A1 20011212; EP 1162066 B1 20051109; AT 309095 T 20051115; CA 2349070 A1 20011209; CA 2349070 C 20050719; CN 1206100 C 20050615; CN 1328919 A 20020102; DE 10028551 A1 20011213; DE 50107950 D1 20051215; DK 1162066 T3 20060116; ES 2250250 T3 20060416; MX PA01005764 A 20020806; US 2001052300 A1 20011220; US 6584898 B2 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180502

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080405

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080406

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-01-04 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091101

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080407

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080405

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080407

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080407

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080405

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081006

2009-01-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080405

2008-12-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-12-08 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-17 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20081006

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *ITW MORLOCK G.M.B.H.LISE-MEITNER-STRASSE 9, D-722

- Effective date: 20051109

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ITW MORLOCK GMBH

- Free text: ITW MORLOCK GMBH#LISE-MEITNER-STRASSE 9#72280 DORNSTETTEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ITW MORLOCK GMBH#LISE-MEITNER-STRASSE 9#72280 DORNSTETTEN (DE)

2007-05-02 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070502

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-04-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070427

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-04-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-04-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-03-22 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-03-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2250250 T3

2006-04-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ITW MORLOCK GMBH

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060209

2006-02-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ITW MORLOCK GMBH

2006-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-01-16 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50107950 P 20051215

2005-12-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-11-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *ITW MORLOCK G.M.B.H.LISE-MEITNER-STRASSE 9, D-722

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-11-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-11-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011124

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI