Global Patent Index - EP 1162073 A4

EP 1162073 A4 2003-06-18 - INK JET TYPE IMAGE FORMING DEVICE

Title (en)

INK JET TYPE IMAGE FORMING DEVICE

Title (de)

TINTENSTRAHL-BILDERZEUGUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

IMPRIMANTE A JET D'ENCRE

Publication

EP 1162073 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00909757 A

Priority

  • JP 0001700 W
  • JP 7457599 A
  • JP 17046599 A
  • JP 17682799 A
  • JP 34769699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1162073A1] Between adjacent pinch rollers 22, an auxiliary roller 44 is provided coaxially with the pinch rollers 22. A large diameter portion 44a of the auxiliary roller 44 presses down a recording medium on a platen 12. Between the auxiliary roller 44 and an image formation zone 41, there is provided a downstream sheet-pressing member 46. The large diameter portion 46a of the downstream sheet-pressing member 46 also presses down the recording medium against the platen 12. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/02; B41J 11/00; B41J 13/14; B41J 29/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/005 (2013.01); B41J 13/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5527123 A 19960618 - JACKSON LARRY A [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0832754 A1 19980401 - CANON KK [JP]
  • [A] US 5365256 A 19941115 - TAKAHASHI TSUTOMU [JP]
  • [A] EP 0737578 A2 19961016 - CANON KK [JP]
  • [A] EP 0719651 A1 19960703 - CANON KK [JP]
  • [A] US 4494166 A 19850115 - BILLINGS PHILIP A [US], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 311 (M - 734) 24 August 1988 (1988-08-24)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 335 (M - 1000) 19 July 1990 (1990-07-19)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section PQ Week 199645, Derwent World Patents Index; Class P75, AN 1996-450507, XP002238204
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 08 30 June 1998 (1998-06-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 477 (M - 885) 27 October 1989 (1989-10-27)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 420 (M - 872) 19 September 1989 (1989-09-19)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 327 (M - 635) 24 October 1987 (1987-10-24)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 199 (M - 240) 3 September 1983 (1983-09-03)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 483 (M - 1472) 2 September 1993 (1993-09-02)
  • See also references of WO 0054975A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162073 A1 20011212; EP 1162073 A4 20030618; EP 1162073 B1 20051228; CN 1173832 C 20041103; CN 1343166 A 20020403; DE 60025175 D1 20060202; DE 60025175 T2 20060622; WO 0054975 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110321

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110321

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60025175

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110321

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100317

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100320

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60025175 P 20060202

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANON FINETECH INC.

2003-06-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 11/02 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 11/00 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 13/14 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 29/17 B

2003-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 11/02 A, 7B 41J 11/00 B, 7B 41J 13/14 B

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE