Global Patent Index - EP 1162079 A2

EP 1162079 A2 2001-12-12 - Device for the cross-linking of ink by UV radiation

Title (en)

Device for the cross-linking of ink by UV radiation

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Härten von Tinten mittels UV-Licht

Title (fr)

Installation de réticulation uv concentrée sur goutte d'encre

Publication

EP 1162079 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 01117496 A

Priority

  • EP 98932230 A
  • FR 9708176 A

Abstract (en)

The ink drop fixing method has a preliminary stage of applying an ultraviolet beam (32) concentrated on the ink drops (31) on the surface, avoiding exposure of the plastic support (30) for the printing. The ink drops are deposited point-by-point on the surface. The ink is made of a material that is polymerisable under ultra-violet radiation. The ultra-violet radiation is provided by an ultra-violet laser (43), which is swept point-by-point across the printed surface. The ultra-violet beam is directed by an optic fibre (71) of a network (70) of optic fibres. The beam is interrupted when it is directed toward the un-inked surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41M 1/30 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); C08F 2/48 (2006.01); B41M 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/0047 (2013.01); B41J 11/002 (2013.01); B41M 5/0064 (2013.01); B41M 7/0081 (2013.01); B41M 5/0076 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2764844 A1 19981224; FR 2764844 B1 19990806; AT 206090 T 20011015; AT 321671 T 20060415; CA 2293551 A1 19981230; CA 2293551 C 20051108; CN 1178799 C 20041208; CN 1260753 A 20000719; DE 69801823 D1 20011031; DE 69801823 T2 20020613; DE 69833974 D1 20060518; DE 69833974 T2 20070111; EP 0993378 A1 20000419; EP 0993378 B1 20010926; EP 1162079 A2 20011212; EP 1162079 A3 20021113; EP 1162079 B1 20060329; ES 2165688 T3 20020316; ES 2262582 T3 20061201; JP 2002504873 A 20020212; JP 4125796 B2 20080730; US 6562413 B1 20030513; WO 9858806 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140619

2015-07-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150724

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140618

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140618

2015-04-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69833974

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140618

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69833974

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120614

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GEMALTO SA, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GEMPLUS, GEMENOS, FR

- Document: DE 69833974

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69833974

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69833974

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2011-07-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110616 AND 20110622

2008-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2007-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2262582 T3

2006-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060718

2006-06-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69833974 P 20060518

2006-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0993378 P

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL SE

2006-03-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2006-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2004-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041109

2004-06-30 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0100 IMPIKA

- Effective date: 20040406

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL SE

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL SE

2001-12-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 993378

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL SE