Global Patent Index - EP 1162079 A3

EP 1162079 A3 2002-11-13 - Device for the cross-linking of ink by UV radiation

Title (en)

Device for the cross-linking of ink by UV radiation

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Härten von Tinten mittels UV-Licht

Title (fr)

Installation de réticulation uv concentrée sur goutte d'encre

Publication

EP 1162079 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 01117496 A

Priority

  • EP 98932230 A
  • FR 9708176 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2764844A1] The invention concerns a method for cross-linking photosensitive inks in particular polymerisable inks (36) by ultraviolet radiation consisting in a step (35) inking dots (31) on a base (38) and a subsequent step consisting in applying a concentrated ultraviolet beam (32) on the inked dots (31), except for the base non-inked surfaces (30). The beam is in particular an ultraviolet laser beam. The invention is applicable to jet dot-matrix printing and polychromy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41M 1/30 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); C08F 2/48 (2006.01); B41M 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/0047 (2013.01); B41J 11/002 (2013.01); B41M 5/0064 (2013.01); B41M 7/0081 (2013.01); B41M 5/0076 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2764844 A1 19981224; FR 2764844 B1 19990806; AT 206090 T 20011015; AT 321671 T 20060415; CA 2293551 A1 19981230; CA 2293551 C 20051108; CN 1178799 C 20041208; CN 1260753 A 20000719; DE 69801823 D1 20011031; DE 69801823 T2 20020613; DE 69833974 D1 20060518; DE 69833974 T2 20070111; EP 0993378 A1 20000419; EP 0993378 B1 20010926; EP 1162079 A2 20011212; EP 1162079 A3 20021113; EP 1162079 B1 20060329; ES 2165688 T3 20020316; ES 2262582 T3 20061201; JP 2002504873 A 20020212; JP 4125796 B2 20080730; US 6562413 B1 20030513; WO 9858806 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140619

2015-07-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150724

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140618

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140618

2015-04-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69833974

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140618

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69833974

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120614

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GEMALTO SA, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GEMPLUS, GEMENOS, FR

- Document: DE 69833974

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69833974

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69833974

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2011-07-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110616 AND 20110622

2008-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2007-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2262582 T3

2006-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060718

2006-06-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69833974 P 20060518

2006-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0993378 P

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL SE

2006-03-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2006-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2004-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041109

2004-06-30 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0100 IMPIKA

- Effective date: 20040406

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL SE

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL SE

2001-12-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 993378

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL SE