Global Patent Index - EP 1162137 A2

EP 1162137 A2 2001-12-12 - Extensible information device for a submarine

Title (en)

Extensible information device for a submarine

Title (de)

Ausfahrbare Informationsvorrichtung für ein U-Boot

Title (fr)

Dispositif télescopique d'information pour sous-marin

Publication

EP 1162137 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01113135 A

Priority

DE 10027829 A

Abstract (en)

A twin piston cylinder device (5) has a first bottom and top open cylinder (6) with a piston (12) supporting an antenna rod (13) on top and a second cylinder (7) with a piston (8) impinged on both sides and supporting the first cylinder on its upper side. A longish, flexible retracting element (14) fastens at one end on the first cylinder's piston and at its other end in the upper end area of the second cylinder when turned round by a turning part (15) on top of the second piston.

Abstract (de)

Die Informationsvorrichtung weist eine Zwillings-Kolben-Zylinder-Einrichtung (5) auf, die einen ersten, unten und oben offenen Zylinder (6) mit einem Kolben (12), der oben vorzugsweise einen Antennenstab (13) trägt, und einen zweiten Zylinder (7) mit einem beidseitig beaufschlagbaren und den ersten Zylinder (6) auf seiner Oberseite tragenden Kolben (8) umfaßt. Ein längliches, biegsames Einziehglied (14) ist mit seinem einen Ende an dem Kolben (12) des ersten Zylinders (6) und nach Umlenkung durch ein oberseitig an dem zweiten Kolben (8) angeordnetes Umlenkteil (15) mit seinem anderen Ende im oberen Endbereich des zweiten Zylinders (7) befestigt. Für die Signalübertragung von und zu dem Antennenstab (13) ist eine im oberen Endbereich des zweiten Zylinders (7) endende elektrische, externe Signalleitung (17) vorgesehen. Das Einziehglied (14) ist zum Leiten elektrischer Signale ausgebildet und steht sowohl mit dem Antennenstab (13) als auch mit der externen Signalleitung (17) in fester elektrischer Verbindung, wobei der erste Zylinder (6) aus einem formstabilen Kunststoffmaterial besteht (Figur 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63G 8/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63G 8/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63G 8/38 (2013.01); H01Q 1/04 (2013.01); H01Q 1/1235 (2013.01); H01Q 1/34 (2013.01); H01Q 9/32 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0372265 B1 19930331

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162137 A2 20011212; EP 1162137 A3 20030514; EP 1162137 B1 20041006; DE 10027829 C1 20020103

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150530

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150530

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150530

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50103942

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140529

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140415

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140311

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-09-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-01-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103942 P 20041111

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030920

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI