Global Patent Index - EP 1162144 A2

EP 1162144 A2 2001-12-12 - Wrapping film package, wrapping method and wrapping machine

Title (en)

Wrapping film package, wrapping method and wrapping machine

Title (de)

Folienverpackung, Umhüllungsverfahren und Umhüllungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Emballage en feuille, procédé d'enveloppement et machine d'enveloppement

Publication

EP 1162144 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01201158 A

Priority

FI 20000699 A

Abstract (en)

A wrapping film package in which the two opposite end faces (15a, 15b) of an object (14) to be wrapped are covered with a length of protective film (35) and a length of wrapping film band (28) is wrapped around the object. In the wrapping method, the end of the protective film is lifted onto the object to be wrapped, whereupon a length of wrapping film is wrapped over it. The second end of the severed protective film sheet is lifted onto the second end portion of the object, whereupon a length of wrapping film is wrapped over it. The wrapping machine (10) comprises devices (30, 40) supplying and cutting a protective film sheet and lifting its ends onto the object to be wrapped and a wrapping apparatus (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 11/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/58 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162144 A2 20011212; EP 1162144 A3 20020320; EP 1162144 B1 20040616; DE 60103813 D1 20040722; DE 60103813 T2 20050714; FI 111066 B 20030530; FI 20000699 A0 20000324; FI 20000699 A 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140326

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140326

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60103813

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140326

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60103813

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100326

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-04-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60103813 P 20040722

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030114

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020920

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OCTOMECA OY

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI