Global Patent Index - EP 1162146 A2

EP 1162146 A2 2001-12-12 - Method and apparatus for forming and packaging groups of individual articles

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for forming and packaging groups of individual articles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bilden und Verpacken von Gruppen einzelner Gegenstände

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour former et emballer des groupes d'objets individuels

Publication

EP 1162146 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112666 A

Priority

DE 10027506 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves feeding the tampons individually (1-12) on an endless conveyor (24) to a collecting conveyor (30) having transverse cells (33) to each receive a number of tampons in a row. The tampons conveyed in several adjacent chambers (33) in the collecting conveyor are pushed out simultaneously to form the groups. Groups can be pushed out from opposing sides of the collecting conveyor.

Abstract (de)

Bei der automatischen Verpackung von langgestreckten, annähernd zylindrischen Gegenständen unterschiedlicher Größe und/oder Ausführung werden zunächst Gruppen (15, 16, 17) bzw. Sammelgruppen (52) gebildet und diese sodann in offene Faltkartons (18) eingeschoben. Die Gruppen (15, 16, 17, 52) werden aus Reihen (31, 32) von übereinander angeordneten Gegenständen (10, 11, 12) durch Querausschub gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 35/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 35/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 35/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162146 A2 20011212; EP 1162146 A3 20020417; EP 1162146 B1 20031210; DE 10027506 A1 20011213

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140525

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140525

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50101109

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140525

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50101109

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130514

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101109 P 20040122

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65B 35/50 A, 7B 65B 35/44 B, 7B 65B 19/34 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI