Global Patent Index - EP 1162148 A2

EP 1162148 A2 2001-12-12 - Reusable drinking cup

Title (en)

Reusable drinking cup

Title (de)

Mehrweg-Trinkbecher

Title (fr)

Gobelet réutilisable

Publication

EP 1162148 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112651 A

Priority

AT 9852000 A

Abstract (en)

A re-useable polycarbonate drinking beaker with a printed section, comprises a printed PET film (3) on the outside of the beaker wall (2). The film is printed on its inside, and is 40-80 mu m thick.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Mehrweg-Trinkbecher aus Polycarbonat (PC), der einen Aufdruck aufweist, ist die Außenseite der Wandung (2) des Trinkbechers zumindest über einen Teil ihrer Oberfläche mit einer bei der Herstellung des Trinkbechers durch Hinterspritzen aufgebrachten, bedruckten Folie (3) aus PET versehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 45/14; A47G 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 19/22 (2006.01); G09F 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 23/08 (2013.01); A47G 19/2227 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP S61259946 A 19861118 - TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162148 A2 20011212; EP 1162148 A3 20040317

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040918

2005-01-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 29C 45/14 A

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47G 19/22 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI