Global Patent Index - EP 1162161 A1

EP 1162161 A1 2001-12-12 - Waste container

Title (en)

Waste container

Title (de)

Abfallsammelbehälter

Title (fr)

Poubelle

Publication

EP 1162161 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01113045 A

Priority

DE 10028298 A

Abstract (en)

A waste container comprises an inner lining that repels dirt. The lining consists of a non-stick polymer material.

Abstract (de)

Abfallsammelbehälter, wobei zumindest dessen Innenauskleidung aus einer schmutzabweisenden Schicht aus einem haftungsverminderndem polymerischen Material besteht.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/02; B65F 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162161 A1 20011212; EP 1162161 B1 20031210; DE 10028298 A1 20011213

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120529

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120529

2012-12-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121201

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110530

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050529

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEIFHEIT A.G.

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-08-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101111 P 20040122

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2003-05-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-11-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI