Global Patent Index - EP 1162167 A1

EP 1162167 A1 2001-12-12 - Method and device for filling bottles, cans and similar containers with a liquid product

Title (en)

Method and device for filling bottles, cans and similar containers with a liquid product

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Füllen von Flaschen, Dosen oder dergleichen Behälter mit einem flüssigen Füllgut sowie Füllmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour remplir des bouteilles, boîtes et récipients similaires de produit liquide

Publication

EP 1162167 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01112180 A

Priority

DE 10028676 A

Abstract (en)

A filling machine (1) fills bottles (2) with drinks like lemonade and has multiple filling points set at equal angles apart on a rotor (3) running round a vertical machine axis. Each filling point consists of a filling element (4) and a container supporter. A ring kettle fits on the rotor with a gas area containing CO2 gas under atmospheric pressure.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren bzw. einer Füllmaschine zum Füllen von Behältern mit einem flüssigen Füllgut wird das flüssige Füllgut erst im jeweiligen Behälter durch Einleiten eines CO2-Gases unter Druck mit Kohlensäure versetzt bzw. karbonisiert.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 3/06; B67C 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/06 (2006.01); B67C 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/10 (2013.01); B67C 3/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162167 A1 20011212; EP 1162167 B1 20030102; DE 10028676 A1 20020620; US 2002014276 A1 20020207; US 6463964 B2 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111122

2011-11-23 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20111114

2004-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1162167E

2003-06-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100075 P 20030206

2003-02-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GR

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: 20030102:NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020115

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI