Global Patent Index - EP 1162183 A1

EP 1162183 A1 2001-12-12 - Ignition mixture for use in gas generators

Title (en)

Ignition mixture for use in gas generators

Title (de)

Anzündmischung zur Verwendung in Gasgeneratoren

Title (fr)

Mélange d'allumage pour utilisation dans les générateurs de gaz

Publication

EP 1162183 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01112894 A

Priority

DE 20010154 U

Abstract (en)

An ignition mixture for use in a vehicle safety device has an oxygen balance of 0 to -20% and comprises (wt.%): (A) a gas-generating component (15-75) containing a guanidine compound as fuel and an inorganic oxidizer; and (B) a thermite component (30-85) containing a metal and a metal oxide.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anzündmischung zur Verwendung in einem Gasgenerator für eine Sicherheitseinrichtung in Fahrzeugen, die dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß die Anzündmischung aus einer gaserzeugenden Zusammensetzung in einem Anteil von 15 bis 70 Gew.-% und einer Thermit-Zusammensetzung in einem Anteil von 30 bis 85 Gew.-% besteht, wobei die gaserzeugende Zusammensetzung im wesentlichen aus einer Guanidinverbindung als Brennstoff und einem anorganischen Oxidator besteht, und die Thermit-Zusammensetzung im wesentlichen aus einem Metall und einem Metalloxid besteht und wobei die Anzündmischung eine Sauerstoffbilanz von zwischen 0 und ­20 % aufweist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06C 9/00; C06B 33/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06C 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 20010154 U1 20000907; DE 50113161 D1 20071206; EP 1162183 A1 20011212; EP 1162183 B1 20071024; US 2002033211 A1 20020321; US 6599380 B2 20030729

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080204

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080124

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113161 P 20071206

2007-10-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TRW AIRBAG SYSTEMS GMBH

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020207

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI