Global Patent Index - EP 1162204 A1

EP 1162204 A1 2001-12-12 - Ionic liquids

Title (en)

Ionic liquids

Title (de)

Ionische Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Liquides ioniques

Publication

EP 1162204 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01111953 A

Priority

DE 10027995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2349903A1] The invention relates to ionic liquids for use in electrochemical cells and for organic syntheses.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ionische Flüssigkeiten zur Anwendung in elektrochemischen Zellen und für organische Synthesen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 9/28; C07D 233/58; H01M 10/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 233/58 (2006.01); C07D 233/54 (2006.01); C07D 521/00 (2006.01); C07F 9/28 (2006.01); H01G 9/02 (2006.01); H01G 9/022 (2006.01); H01M 10/052 (2010.01); H01M 10/0568 (2010.01); H01M 10/08 (2006.01); H01M 10/36 (2010.01); H01M 6/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01G 9/022 (2013.01); C07D 231/12 (2013.01); C07D 233/56 (2013.01); C07D 249/08 (2013.01); C07F 9/28 (2013.01); C10M 171/00 (2013.01); H01M 10/052 (2013.01); H01M 10/0568 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/223 (2013.01); C10M 2215/224 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2219/104 (2013.01); C10M 2223/063 (2013.01); C10N 2220/04 (2013.01); C10N 2230/10 (2013.01); C10N 2230/12 (2013.01); C10N 2240/08 (2013.01); C10N 2240/20 (2013.01); H01M 6/164 (2013.01); Y02E 60/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162204 A1 20011212; EP 1162204 B1 20050720; BR 0102318 A 20020213; CA 2349903 A1 20011209; CA 2349903 C 20100202; CN 100413873 C 20080827; CN 1327986 A 20011226; DE 10027995 A1 20011213; JP 2002025610 A 20020125; JP 5236135 B2 20130717; KR 100781473 B1 20071203; KR 20020017934 A 20020307; RU 2272043 C2 20060320; TW I300780 B 20080911; US 2002015884 A1 20020207; US 7153974 B2 20061226

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2017-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50106762

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110521

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110521

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051021

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106762 P 20050825

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020308

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI