Global Patent Index - EP 1162258 A2

EP 1162258 A2 2001-12-12 - Detergent tablet

Title (en)

Detergent tablet

Title (de)

Waschmitteltablette

Title (fr)

Tablette détergente

Publication

EP 1162258 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01203388 A

Priority

  • EP 98938306 A
  • GB 9716351 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a detergent tablet comprising: a) a compressed portion comprising active detergent components; b) a non compressed, non-encapsulating portion comprising active detergent components. Detergent components which are sensitive to compression can be incorporated into tablets and greater control of washing processes can be achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/08; C11D 3/386

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/384 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/37 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/384 (2013.01); C11D 3/386 (2013.01); C11D 17/0078 (2013.01); C11D 17/0091 (2013.01); C11D 3/39 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2327949 A 19990210; GB 9716351 D0 19971008; AT 226626 T 20021115; AT 251665 T 20031015; AT 350456 T 20070115; BR 9815605 A 20011120; CA 2298510 A1 19990211; CA 2298510 C 20040511; CN 1218029 C 20050907; CN 1272875 A 20001108; DE 69808885 D1 20021128; DE 69808885 T2 20030618; DE 69818871 D1 20031113; DE 69818871 T2 20040722; DE 69836835 D1 20070215; DE 69836835 T2 20071011; DK 0960187 T3 20030224; EP 0960187 A1 19991201; EP 0960187 B1 20021023; EP 1134281 A1 20010919; EP 1134281 B1 20031008; EP 1162258 A2 20011212; EP 1162258 A3 20040114; EP 1162258 B1 20070103; ES 2142782 T1 20000501; ES 2142782 T3 20030501; ES 2206365 T3 20040516; ES 2280302 T3 20070916; JP 2001512177 A 20010821; PT 960187 E 20030331; WO 9906522 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-29 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2011-02-23 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100302

2011-02-23 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100708

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100819

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100812

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100809

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100819

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100809

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070803

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070803

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-01-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-11-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2280302 T3

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070604

2007-04-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-02-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69836835 P 20070215

2007-01-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0960187 P

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2007-01-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-01-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 17/00 A

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/386 B

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/08 B

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-12-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 960187

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE