Global Patent Index - EP 1162289 A1

EP 1162289 A1 2001-12-12 - Palladium electroplating bath and process for electroplating

Title (en)

Palladium electroplating bath and process for electroplating

Title (de)

Palladium-Elektroplatierungsbad und Verfahren zur Elektroplatierung

Title (fr)

Bain pour l'electrodeposition de palladium et processus pour l'electrodeposition

Publication

EP 1162289 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01304721 A

Priority

US 59023400 A

Abstract (en)

An electroplating bath includes a metal-sulfonic acid complex wherein the metal is a precious metal, and free sulfonic acid. The precious metals include Pd, Au, Hard Au (with Ni or Co as hardening agents), Pt, Rh, Ru, Ag and alloys thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 3/50; C25D 3/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/50 (2006.01); C25D 3/52 (2006.01); C25D 3/56 (2006.01); C25D 5/34 (2006.01); C25D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/52 (2013.01); C25D 3/567 (2013.01); C25D 5/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4244739 A 19810113 - CAGNASSI ROBERTO
  • [X] US 4465563 A 19840814 - NOBEL FRED I [US]
  • [PX] WO 0056952 A1 20000928 - TECHNIC [US], et al
  • [PX] US 6165342 A 20001226 - KUHN WERNER [DE], et al
  • [XA] US 4673472 A 19870616 - MORRISSEY RONALD J [US], et al
  • [E] US 6251249 B1 20010626 - CHEVALIER JEAN W [US], et al
  • [PX] DE 19928047 A1 20001221 - HOFFACKER GERHARD [DE]
  • [A] US 4098656 A 19780704 - DEUBER JOHN MARTIN
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 13 30 November 1998 (1998-11-30) & US 6099713 A 20000808 - YANADA ISAMU [JP], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 06 28 June 1996 (1996-06-28)
  • [X] MASAKI S: "Mirror-Bright Silver Plating from a Cyanide-Free Bath", METAL FINISHING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 96, no. 1, 1998, pages 16,18 - 20, XP004113126, ISSN: 0026-0576
  • [X] TETSUYA KONDO ET AL: "SILVER PLATING FROM SILVER METHANESULFONATE-POTASSIUM IODIDE BATH", METAL FINISHING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 89, no. 10, 1 October 1991 (1991-10-01), pages 32 - 36, XP000261679, ISSN: 0026-0576

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162289 A1 20011212; JP 2002060989 A 20020228

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1038383

2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI