Global Patent Index - EP 1162292 A1

EP 1162292 A1 2001-12-12 - Polyolefin fibers having high and permanent hydrophile characteristics and extrusion and spinning process thereof

Title (en)

Polyolefin fibers having high and permanent hydrophile characteristics and extrusion and spinning process thereof

Title (de)

Polyolefinfasern mit hohen und permanenten hydrophilen Eigenschaften und Verfahren zum Extrudieren und Spinnen derselben

Title (fr)

Fibres en polyoléfines ayant des caractéristiques hydrophiles élevées et permanentes et procédé pour leur extrusion et filage

Publication

EP 1162292 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00830374 A

Priority

EP 00830374 A

Abstract (en)

Polyolefin fibers having high and permanent hydrophile characteristics obtained from a mixture of a polyolefin and a polyamide. Such fibers are produced by extrusion through the holes of a die and by spinning comprising the following steps: feeding the mixture of polyolefin and polyamide to an accumulation chamber (3) by means of a pump formed by two parallel, cooperating, rotary and grooved cylinders (2), placed perpendicularly with respect to the axis of the die holes; melting the mixture in a melting chamber; mixing the molten mixture in a heated melting chamber at a temperature higher than that of melting of the mixture by at least 10 DEG C, and extruding the molten mixture through the holes of a die (0) heated to a temperature higher than that of the mixture by about 10 DEG C. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/46; D01D 1/06; D01D 1/09; D01D 5/28; D01F 6/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 1/06 (2006.01); D01D 1/09 (2006.01); D01D 5/28 (2006.01); D01F 6/46 (2006.01); D01F 6/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/46 (2013.01); D01D 1/06 (2013.01); D01D 1/09 (2013.01); D01D 5/28 (2013.01); D01F 6/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162292 A1 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020118

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI