Global Patent Index - EP 1162299 A1

EP 1162299 A1 2001-12-12 - Machine for the treatment of cord fabrics, in particular for dyeing

Title (en)

Machine for the treatment of cord fabrics, in particular for dyeing

Title (de)

Maschine zur Behandlung, insbesondere zum Färben von strangförmigen Geweben

Title (fr)

Machine pour le traitement, notamment la teinture, des tissus sous forme de boyau

Publication

EP 1162299 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201993 A

Priority

EP 00201993 A

Abstract (en)

A compact machine for the treatment of cord fabrics, in particular for dyeing, is made up of a container (11) of any shape, in one top part of which is set at least one motor-driven reel (16) for moving the cord fabric (17), a device (18) for jet-dyeing by the spraying of dye on the fabric (17) set on at least one side of the at least one reel (16), and a device (30) for overflow-dyeing of the fabric (17), which is set on the other side of the at least one reel (16), there being set underneath said at least one reel (16) und underneath said devices (18,30) a reservoir (48), which is designed to contain the fabric (17) and the treatment liquid bath and which can move basically crosswise with respect to the direction of displacement of the cord fabric (17) in order to fold the cord fabric (17) in the reservoir (48) itself. The displacement of the reservoir (48) inside the container (11) is simply crosswise in a rectilinear or curvilinear fashion, or else is a motion made up of both types of motion, and the speed of the reservoir (48) is fixed, or else variable in time. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] FR 2681615 A1 19930326 - GABER SRL [IT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162299 A1 20011212; EP 1162299 B1 20040506; AT 266112 T 20040515; DE 60010445 D1 20040609; DE 60010445 T2 20050512; DK 1162299 T3 20040830; ES 2219258 T3 20041201; PT 1162299 E 20040930

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20040402265

- Effective date: 20110104

2013-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100607

2011-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110104

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101206

2011-01-31 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2011-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-12-15 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20101206

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090604

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090709

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090603

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CABERTEX DI BERLENDIS CLAUDIA E C. S.N.C.

- Free text: CABERTEX DI BERLENDIS CLAUDIA E C. S.N.C.#VIA GIORGIO E GUIDO PAGLIA 7/C#24100 BERGAMO (IT) -TRANSFER TO- CABERTEX DI BERLENDIS CLAUDIA E C. S.N.C.#VIA GIORGIO E GUIDO PAGLIA 7/C#24100 BERGAMO (IT)

2005-06-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050606

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-03-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040806

2005-03-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219258 T3

2004-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-08-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-08-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040402265

2004-08-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60010445 P 20040609

2004-06-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040608

2004-06-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040606

2004-05-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-03-03 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0100 BRAZZOLI S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-08-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CABERTEX DI BERLENDIS CLAUDIA E C. S.N.C.

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERLENDIS, LORENZO

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010620

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI