Global Patent Index - EP 1162304 A1

EP 1162304 A1 2001-12-12 - Interlining

Title (en)

Interlining

Title (de)

Fixiereinlage

Title (fr)

Triplure

Publication

EP 1162304 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01111304 A

Priority

DE 10027957 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10027957C1] Fixing linings comprise a one-layer textile breadth with 2-layer adhesive dots on one side. The lower dots (A), on the textile side, are based on a powder mixture of 25-90 wt.% epoxide resin and 10-75 wt.% acid-terminated polyamide, polyester, polyurethane and/or vinyl copolymer with lateral carboxyl, anhydro, hydroxy and/or amido groups. These are covered by upper dots (B) of acid-terminated polyamide and/or copolyester. The (A)/(B) weight ratio is 1:(0.5-5). Fixing linings consist of a one-layer textile breadth coated with 2-layer adhesive dots on one side, with lower dots on the textile side, covered by upper dots. The lower dots consist of a powder mixture of 25-90 wt.% epoxide resin with an epoxide equivalent weight of 500-4000 milliequivalents/kg and 10-75 wt.% acid-terminated polyamide, polyester, polyurethane and/or vinyl copolymer with lateral carboxyl, anhydro, hydroxy and/or amido groups and a melt flow index (MFI) of 40-120 g/10 minutes at 160 deg C and 2.16 kg, 0-20 wt.% hardener and commercially-available ancillaries and additives for making a paste; the upper dots consists of acid-terminated polyamide and/or copolyester; and the weight ratio of lower to upper dots is 1:(0.5-5). An Independent claim is also included for the production of a fixing lining of this type.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Fixiereinlage, bestehend aus einer textilen Einlagebahn (1), die auf einer Seite mit doppelschichtigen Haftmassenpunkten beschichtet ist, die aus der Einlagebahn zugewandten Unter- und darüber angeordneten Oberpunkten (2,3) besteht, bei der die Unterpunkte (2) aus einem pulverförmigen Gemisch von 25 bis 90 Gew.% eines Epoxidharzes mit einem Epoxidequivalentgewicht von 500 bis 4000 mVal/kg und 10 bis 75 Gew.% eines säureterminierten Polyamids, eines Polyesters, eines Polyurethans und/oder eines Vinylcopolymerisats mit Carboxyl-, Anhydro-, Hydroxy- und/oder Amido-Seitengruppen und einem Meltflow-Index (MFI) von 40 bis 120 g/10min gemessen bei 160°C und 2,16 Kg, 0 bis 20 Gew.% eines Härters sowie herkömmlichen zur Herstellung einer Paste eingesetzter Hilfs- und Zuschlagstoffen als Unterpunkt (2) und die Oberpunkte (3) aus säureterminierten Polyamiden und/oder Copolyestern bestehen, wobei das Gesichtsverhältnis der in den Unter- und Oberpunkten (2,3) enthaltenen Massen 1:0,5 bis 1:5 beträgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 17/04; A41D 27/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/06 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2481 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24843 (2013.01); Y10T 428/28 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2813 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2843 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2848 (2013.01); Y10T 428/287 (2013.01); Y10T 442/2738 (2015.04); Y10T 442/2746 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10027957 C1 20010927; AT 235593 T 20030415; CN 1180157 C 20041215; CN 1328793 A 20020102; EP 1162304 A1 20011212; EP 1162304 B1 20030326; ES 2193999 T3 20031116; JP 2002020919 A 20020123; JP 3471331 B2 20031202; KR 100393664 B1 20030806; TR 200101559 A2 20020121; TR 200101559 A3 20020121; US 2002019185 A1 20020214; US 6777065 B2 20040817

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180517

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160510

2018-05-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160509

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160509

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160509

2017-01-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-05-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150516

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150516

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150518

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150511

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

- Free text: CARL FREUDENBERG KG#HOEHNERWEG 2-4#69469 WEINHEIM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CARL FREUDENBERG KG#HOEHNERWEG 2-4#69469 WEINHEIM (DE)

2007-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060819

2006-12-27 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20060819

2006-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LAINIERE DE PICARDIE, BUIRE COURCELLES

2006-03-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: LAINIERE DE PICARDIE, BUIRE COURCELLES

- Effective date: 20031223

2004-05-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LAINIERE DE PICARDIE, BUIRE COURCELLES

2004-02-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LAINIERE DE PICARDIE, BUIRE COURCELLES

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CARL *FREUDENBERG K.G.

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1162304E

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193999 T3

2003-06-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-05-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100126 P 20030430

2003-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI