Global Patent Index - EP 1162309 A1

EP 1162309 A1 2001-12-12 - Railway track tamping device and method

Title (en)

Railway track tamping device and method

Title (de)

Verfahren und Maschine zur Unterstopfung eines Gleises

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le bourrage des voies ferrées

Publication

EP 1162309 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01890121 A

Priority

AT 4312000 U

Abstract (en)

A rail-lifting section (19) of a machine (1) for tamping down rails is bordered by two rail-mounted devices (4) and extended in a rail's lengthwise direction in a first operational movement for lifting a rail (2) and laying gravel underneath the rail. The rail-lifting section is shortened in a second operational movement for completing the scheduled positioning and tamping down of the rail.

Abstract (de)

Ein durch zwei Schienenfahrwerke (4) begrenzter Gleishebeabschnitt (19) einer Maschine (1) zur Gleisunterstopfung wird in einer ersten Arbeitsfahrt für eine Gleisanhebung und Einbringung von Schotter unterhalb des Gleises (2) in Gleislängsrichtung verlängert. In einer weiteren Arbeitsfahrt zur Erzeugung der endgültigen Soll-Lage und Unterstopfung des Gleises (2) wird der Gleishebeabschnitt (19) verkürzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 27/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/12 (2006.01); E01B 27/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/17 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162309 A1 20011212; EP 1162309 B1 20050406; AT 292713 T 20050415; AT 3876 U2 20000925; AT 3876 U3 20010226; CA 2350166 A1 20011209; CA 2350166 C 20050809; CN 1205390 C 20050608; CN 1329196 A 20020102; DE 50105805 D1 20050512; DK 1162309 T3 20050620; ES 2240391 T3 20051016; JP 2002013101 A 20020118; JP 4824203 B2 20111130; PL 208240 B1 20110429; PL 347848 A1 20011217; RU 2225908 C2 20040320; UA 72899 C2 20011217; US 2001050022 A1 20011213; US 6481358 B2 20021119

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180629

2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170425

2018-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170430

2018-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170426

2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170425

2017-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170425

2017-11-20 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170430

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160425

2016-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 292713 T

- Effective date: 20160425

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160315

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160315

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-03-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150312

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PLASSER & THEURER, EXPORT VON BAHNBAUMASCHINEN, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANZ PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCHINEN-INDUSTRIEGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H., WIEN, AT

- Document: DE 50105805

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50105805

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50105805

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRANZ PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCHINEN-INDUSTRIEGESELLSCHA

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060110

2006-02-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRANZ PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCHINEN-INDUSTRIEGESELLSCHA

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2240391 T3

2005-10-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-09-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050908

2005-07-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-06-20 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2005-06-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50105805 P 20050512

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-04-25 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050425

2005-04-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050425

2005-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-04-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-04-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-04-06 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050406

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031112

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020427

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI