Global Patent Index - EP 1162310 A2

EP 1162310 A2 2001-12-12 - Tamping machine

Title (en)

Tamping machine

Title (de)

Stopfmaschine

Title (fr)

Bourreuse

Publication

EP 1162310 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01890135 A

Priority

AT 4342000 U

Abstract (en)

A tamping machine (1) is fitted with rail lifting gear (17) adjusted for height by driving mechanisms (16) and positioned between devices travelling on rails and directly in front of tamping equipment in respect of the operating direction of the machine. The rail lifting gear serves to level and align a main rail (32). The tamping machine has a supplementary lifting device (18) to lift the branch leg of a rail turnout.

Abstract (de)

Eine Stopfmaschine (1) zum Unterstopfen eines Gleises ist mit einem zwischen Schienenfahrwerken und ­ bezüglich einer Arbeitsrichtung der Maschine (1) ­ unmittelbar vor einem Stopfaggregat positionierten, durch Antriebe (16) höhenverstellbaren Gleishebeaggregat (17) ausgestattet. Dieses dient zum Nivellieren und Richten eines eine Gleisebene (39) bildenden und von den Schienenfahrwerken befahrenen Haupt-Gleises (32). Die Stopfmaschine (1) weist weiters eine Zusatzhebeeinrichtung (18) zum Anheben eines vom Haupt-Gleis (32) abzweigenden Abzweigstranges (27) einer Weiche (28) auf, wobei dem Gleishebeaggregat (17) und der Zusatzhebeeinrichtung (18) ein gemeinsames Meßsystem (20) für eine kontrollierte Anhebung der Weiche (28) zugeordnet ist. Das gemeinsame Meßsystem (20) besteht aus einer das Gleishebeaggregat (17) mit der Zusatzhebeeinrichtung (18) verbindenden, teleskopisch in Maschinenquerrichtung verlängerbaren mechanischen Meßvorrichtung (36) mit einem Meßwertgeber (41). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 27/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/17 (2006.01); E01B 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/17 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4905604 A 19900306 - THEURER JOSEF [AT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162310 A2 20011212; EP 1162310 A3 20030423; EP 1162310 B1 20040908; AT 3877 U2 20000925; AT 3877 U3 20010326; CN 100436711 C 20081126; CN 1329195 A 20020102; DE 50103508 D1 20041014; ES 2227110 T3 20050401; RU 2195523 C1 20021227; UA 72900 C2 20011217; US 2001050021 A1 20011213; US 6546876 B2 20030415

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-04 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150510

2016-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 275671 T

- Effective date: 20150510

2014-11-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PLASSER & THEURER, EXPORT VON BAHNBAUMASCHINEN, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANZ PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCHINEN-INDUSTRIEGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H., WIEN, AT

- Document: DE 50103508

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50103508

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50103508

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-07-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-05-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227110 T3

2005-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-12-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103508 P 20041014

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-01-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI