Global Patent Index - EP 1162314 A1

EP 1162314 A1 2001-12-12 - Connecting device for a metal tube and a concrete beam or plate

Title (en)

Connecting device for a metal tube and a concrete beam or plate

Title (de)

Verbindungsvorrichtung für ein Metallrohr und einen Träger oder eine Decke aus Beton

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion d'un tube métallique et d'une poutre ou dalle en béton

Publication

EP 1162314 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01401453 A

Priority

FR 0007203 A

Abstract (en)

The connection for a trellis metal tube (1) and a concrete beam (P) comprises at each end of a tube a metal plate welded at the tube end perpendicularly to the tube axis. The plate is supported on the beam and has several holes (3) into which are engaged plate fixing screws (7,9,10) to bars (6) embedded in the beam concrete.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 2/00; E01D 101/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 15/14 (2006.01); E01D 2/00 (2006.01); E04B 1/38 (2006.01); E04B 1/58 (2006.01); E04B 5/43 (2006.01); E04C 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 2/00 (2013.01); E01D 2101/285 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162314 A1 20011212; EP 1162314 B1 20061129; DE 60124816 D1 20070111; DE 60124816 T2 20071011; ES 2275636 T3 20070616; FR 2809757 A1 20011207; FR 2809757 B1 20020830; JP 2002054242 A 20020220; JP 4706129 B2 20110622

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160607

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160606

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160606

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60124816

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150717

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1043618

2007-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2275636 T3

2007-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070314

2007-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60124816 P 20070111

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

2006-11-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050408

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020527

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI