Global Patent Index - EP 1162328 A2

EP 1162328 A2 2001-12-12 - System for fixing sun protection cloth

Title (en)

System for fixing sun protection cloth

Title (de)

Befestigungssystem für Sonnensegel

Title (fr)

Systeme de fixation pour toile de protection contre le soleil

Publication

EP 1162328 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112191 A

Priority

DE 10027764 A

Abstract (en)

The awning is supported by two parallel cables (2,3) each running between two tension holders (4,5) fixed on the house wall and with the holder for the lower cable having two stays (7,8) each provided with a traction or bending element (9,10) acting on the stays and generating a pulling force to draw the cable outwards. The stays are fixed on the house wall by angle brackets so that the stays are movable in the sockets thereof.

Abstract (de)

Zur Stabilitätserhöhung einer Seilführung für ein Sonnensegel 1 wird vorgeschlagen, die die Seilführung (3) tragenden Haltestreben (7, 8) mittels seitlicher Zugelemente (9, 10) vorzuspannen (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 10/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162328 A2 20011212; EP 1162328 A3 20030709; DE 10027764 A1 20020103; DE 10027764 B4 20060928

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080320

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI