Global Patent Index - EP 1162334 A1

EP 1162334 A1 2001-12-12 - Anti-slip fire-proof lock

Title (en)

Anti-slip fire-proof lock

Title (de)

Gleit- und brandsicheres Schloss

Title (fr)

Serrure anti-glissement résistante au feu

Publication

EP 1162334 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01401071 A

Priority

FR 0007268 A

Abstract (en)

The lock comprises a box (1) made of a material having a high melting point and a bolt (8) made of a material with a lower melting point. The bolt is mounted on the box to be mobile between a locking position in which it projects to engage a latch (5), and a retracted position in which the door may be opened. An auxiliary bolt (9) is also provided, this being made from a material having a high melting point. The lock comprises a box (1) made of a material having a high melting point which is intended to be fixed to the door (2), and a bolt (8) made of a material with a lower melting point. The bolt is mounted on the box to be mobile between a locking position in which it projects to engage a latch (5), and a retracted position in which the door may be opened. An auxiliary bolt (9) is also provided, this being made from a material having a high melting point. An elastic return device (19) is provided within the lock. Links (11,21) connect together the two bolts, and at least one of these is made from a material which melts at a temperature between the ambient operating temperature and that at which the first bolt melts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/10; E05B 15/16; E05B 63/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/10 (2006.01); E05B 65/10 (2006.01); E05C 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/104 (2013.01); E05B 15/102 (2013.01); E05C 3/124 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162334 A1 20011212; EP 1162334 B1 20050615; FR 2810065 A1 20011214; FR 2810065 B1 20040423

INPADOC legal status


2015-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130426

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130426

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20120409

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): IT TR

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VACHETTE

2002-10-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: IT TR

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020311

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): IT TR

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI