Global Patent Index - EP 1162340 A1

EP 1162340 A1 2001-12-12 - Door element, especially inner door element

Title (en)

Door element, especially inner door element

Title (de)

Türelement, insbesondere Innentürelement

Title (fr)

Elément de porte, notamment élément de porte intérieure

Publication

EP 1162340 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112175 A

Priority

  • EP 00112175 A
  • DE 20010190 U

Abstract (en)

The door component has a frame pivotable around a vertical axis and a filling arranged in the frame aperture. A frame core has a double central layer (1') comprising a number of adhered strips, a connecting layer (8) positioned centrally between the strip bunches (7) and adhered to the strips and support layers (10) for veneers (11) formed on turned-away side surfaces of both strip bunches. The central layer is formed from a soft wood, e.g. spruce, or a carpentry plate.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Türelement, insbesondere Innentürelement mit einem um eine lotrechte Achse verschwenkbaren Rahmen und mindestens einer in einer Rahmenöffnung angeordneten Füllung, ist die Sicherung der statischen Funktionen und eine Stabilisierung durch einen Rahmenkern mit einer doppelten Mittellage (1') aus einer Anzahl durch Adhäsion miteinander verbundenen Leisten, einer mittig zwischen den Leistenbunden (7) mit diesen verklebten Verbindungsschicht (8) und auf den einander abgewandten Seitenflächen (9) beider Leistenbunden (7) ausgebildeten Trägerschichten (10) für Furniere (11) sowie an den längs- und oberseitigen Randbereichen des Rahmens (1) und den Randbereichen der Rahmenöffnungen (3, 4) fest angeordneten, durch Profile gebildeten Einleimern (12, 13), erreicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/74 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/74 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7067 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7069 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7071 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162340 A1 20011212; DE 20010190 U1 20010719

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040309

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20020624

2002-06-19 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20020325

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011218

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI