Global Patent Index - EP 1162341 A1

EP 1162341 A1 2001-12-12 - Floor sealing for a door leaf

Title (en)

Floor sealing for a door leaf

Title (de)

Bodendichtung für ein Türblatt

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étanchéité de sol pour une porte

Publication

EP 1162341 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01105667 A

Priority

DE 20005376 U

Abstract (en)

Floor seal for a door comprises an essentially reverse U-shaped profile (1) which is fixed in a groove on the underside of the door, a rail (2) inserted in the profile which is moved against a spring force from a raised rest position into a lowered sealing position with the aid of a mechanism operated on closing the door, and a sealing element (3) made from elastic material and fixed to the rail. The sealing element surrounds at least one arm (1a) of the profile with a flat strip-like extension (10) and lies on the outer side of the arm. An Independent claim is also included for a door having a floor seal.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Bodendichtung für ein Türblatt, mit einem im wesentlichen umgekehrt U-förmigen Einbauprofil, das in einer Nut an der Unterseite des Türblatts befestigbar ist, mit einer im Einbauprofil geführten Schiene, die mit Hilfe einer beim Schließen der Tür betätigten Mechanik gegen Federkraft aus einer nach oben zurückgezogenen Ruhestellung in eine abgesenkte Dichtstellung bewegbar ist, und mit einem an der Schiene befestigten Abdichtelement aus elastischem Material. Die Erfindung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass das Abdichtelement (3) mindestens einen Schenkel (1a) des Einbauprofils (1) mit einem flachleistenförmigen Fortsatz (10) umfasst und auf der Aussenseite des Schenkels (1a) anliegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 20005376 U1 20010726; AT 231947 T 20030215; EP 1162341 A1 20011212; EP 1162341 B1 20030129

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PLANET GDZ AG

- Free text: PLANET GDZ AG#EIGENTALSTRASSE 7#8309 NUERENSDORF (CH) -TRANSFER TO- PLANET GDZ AG#NEUSTADTSTRASSE 2#8317 TAGELSWANGEN (CH)

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2007-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PLANET GDZ AG

- Free text: KROSS GMBH#KUHLENSTUECK 8#58644 ISERLOHN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- PLANET GDZ AG#EIGENTALSTRASSE 7#8309 NUERENSDORF (CH)

2007-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KROSS GMBH

- Free text: KROSS, MANFRED#KUHLENSTUECK 8#58644 ISERLOHN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- KROSS GMBH#KUHLENSTUECK 8#58644 ISERLOHN (DE)

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1162341E

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100092 P 20030306

2003-03-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE IT LI

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011127

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI