Global Patent Index - EP 1162344 A1

EP 1162344 A1 2001-12-12 - Friction reducing drillstring component

Title (en)

Friction reducing drillstring component

Title (de)

Reibungsreduzierender Teil eines Bohrgestänges

Title (fr)

Elément de tige de forage à réduction de frottement

Publication

EP 1162344 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01302461 A

Priority

GB 0006218 A

Abstract (en)

A friction and/or torque reducing drillstring component has a one-piece mandrel body 5 with a mandrel body recess 13c considerably smaller than mandrel upper neck 13a and mandrel body lower neck 13b, dressed with an outer sleeve 18 which is interlocked with a two-piece inner bearing 20 through several integral dove-tailed splines 22b and grooves 22a. The combination of the outer sleeve 18 and inner bearing 20 is restricted in vertical movement over the said mandrel body 5 by an integral, optionally spirally, bladed first stop 15 and a removable second stop 16. The removable second stop 16 is locked onto the mandrel body upper neck 13a by means of threaded retaining bolts 24. Once the second stop 16 is removed, the one-piece outer sleeve 18 is retractable over the mandrel body upper neck 13a to allow the removal of the two-piece inner bearing 20. A second inner bearing 155 may also be provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/1064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

GB 0106480 D0 20010502; GB 2360305 A9 20011010; GB 2360305 A 20010919; EP 1162344 A1 20011212; GB 0006218 D0 20000503; US 2002129976 A1 20020919

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040405

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC.

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI