Global Patent Index - EP 1162364 A1

EP 1162364 A1 2001-12-12 - Fuel injection apparatus

Title (en)

Fuel injection apparatus

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de combustible

Publication

EP 1162364 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01113920 A

Priority

JP 2000177171 A

Abstract (en)

Orifice pieces (100) are disposed in connecting portions between a common rail (3) and high-pressure fuel pipes (11) that supply high-pressure fuel to fuel injection valves (10a-10d). Each orifice piece (100) has, in its interior, a fuel passage that is formed by an inlet-side taper portion (111), a small-diameter constricted portion (113), and an outlet-side taper portion (115). The inclination angle of a wall surface of the outlet-side taper portion (115) is set smaller than the inclination angle of a wall surface of the inlet-side portion (111). The provision of the outlet-side taper portion (115) with a small inclination angle prevents an increase in the resistance of flow of fuel in the direction from the common rail (3) toward a corresponding one of the fuel injection valves (10a-10d). The provision of the inlet-side taper portion (111) with a great inclination angle increases the fuel flow resistance due to pressure pulsation from the corresponding one of the fuel injection valves (10a-10d) toward the common rail. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 55/04 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 55/005 (2013.01); F02M 55/04 (2013.01); F02M 2200/28 (2013.01); F02M 2200/315 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H09112380 A 19970428 - DENSO CORP

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4356091 A 19821026 - NILES ALBERT B
  • [A] US 5903964 A 19990518 - UEMATSU TADAHIRO [JP], et al
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 08 29 August 1997 (1997-08-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 03 27 February 1998 (1998-02-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162364 A1 20011212; EP 1162364 B1 20020925; DE 60100030 D1 20021031; DE 60100030 T2 20030206; JP 2001349261 A 20011221; JP 3558008 B2 20040825

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090608

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090607

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090607

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090607

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080611

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080612

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080609

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60100030 20021031

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020207

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI