Global Patent Index - EP 1162368 A2

EP 1162368 A2 2001-12-12 - Method and circuit for heating a glow-plug

Title (en)

Method and circuit for heating a glow-plug

Title (de)

Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zum Aufheizen einer Glühkerze

Title (fr)

Procédé et circuit pour le chauffage d'une bougie de préchauffage

Publication

EP 1162368 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112481 A

Priority

DE 10028073 A

Abstract (en)

A heater plug receives a supply voltage via a precision resistor (12) and a switch (11). A control unit (16) measures a voltage drop with the precision resistor and uses this and the voltage measured to determine heat energy fed to the heater plug. A signal sent out at the control unit's output (15) controls the switch. After the control unit closes the switch, the heater plug is supplied with energy added up in the control unit.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zum Aufheizen einer Glühkerze eines gegebenen Glühkerzentyps in einer gegebenen Anordnung in einer Brennkraftmaschine auf eine vorbestimmte Temperatur. Über einen Meßwiderstand (12) und einen Schalter (11) liegt die Versorgungsspannung an der Glühkerze. Eine Steuer- und Regeleinheit (16) greift den Spannungsabfall über dem Meßwiderstand (12) ab und ermittelt daraus und aus der ebenfalls abgegriffenen Spannung an der Glühkerze die der Glühkerze zugeführte Heizenergie. Das am Ausgang (15) der Einheit (16) auftretende Signal steuert den Schalter (11). Nach Schließen des Schalters (11) durch die Einheit (16) wird die Glühkerze mit Heizenergie versorgt, die in der Einheit (16) aufaddiert wird. Sobald die aus den bekannten Parametern der Glühkerze sowie der Ausgangstemperatur vorher ermittelte und zum Aufheizen auf eine vorbestimmte Temperatur benötigte Heizenergie erreicht ist, wird der Schalter über das Ausgangssignal am Ausgang (15) wieder geöffnet1 <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 19/02; F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 19/02 (2006.01); F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 19/025 (2013.01); F02P 19/021 (2013.01); F02P 19/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162368 A2 20011212; EP 1162368 A3 20040915; DE 10028073 A1 20011220; DE 10028073 C2 20030410; JP 2002039043 A 20020206; US 2001050275 A1 20011213; US 6635851 B2 20031021

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-02 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140222

2011-09-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BORGWARNER BERU SYSTEMS GMBH

2011-06-22 [19F] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER STAY OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20110801

2010-04-14 [19A] STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20100309

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041206

2005-06-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02P 19/02 A

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 23Q 7/00 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI