Global Patent Index - EP 1162373 A2

EP 1162373 A2 2001-12-12 - Method and apparatus for generating a high pressure fluid

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for generating a high pressure fluid

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zum Erzeugen eines Hochdruckfluids

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour générer un fluide à haute pression

Publication

EP 1162373 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01111618 A

Priority

DE 10028863 A

Abstract (en)

A delivery device (4) has a drive unit (7) and a delivery unit (3) driven by the drive unit linked to a low-pressure fluid line (1) downstream on the inlet side from a low-pressure delivery device (9) working in the low-pressure fluid line and upstream from this low-pressure delivery device on the outlet side. On the inlet side the delivery unit connects to the low-pressure fluid line.

Abstract (de)

Das Hochdruckfluid wird in einer Hochdruck-Fördereinrichtung (4) erzeugt, die eine Antriebseinheit (7) und eine von dieser angetriebene Fördereinheit (3) aufweist. Die Antriebseinheit (7) ist an eine Niederdruck-Fluidleitung (1) angeschlossen, und zwar einlaßseitig stromab und auslaßseitig stromauf einer in der Niederdruck-Fluidleitung (1) arbeitenden Niederdruck-Fördereinrichtung (9). Auch die Fördereinheit (3) der Hochdruck-Fördereinrichtung (4) ist einlaßseitig an die Niederdruck-Fluidleitung (1) angeschlossen, und zwar stromab der Niederdruck-Fördereinrichtung (9). Auslaßseitig liefert die Fördereinheit (3) das Hochdruckfluid. Es wird also das über der Niederdruck-Fördereinrichtung (9) zur Verfügung stehende Druckgefälle genutzt, um in einfacher und energetisch günstiger Weise das Hochdruckfluid zu erzeugen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 25/00; F04D 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/04 (2006.01); F04D 25/04 (2006.01); F25J 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/043 (2013.01); F04D 25/04 (2013.01); F25J 1/0022 (2013.01); F25J 1/0035 (2013.01); F25J 1/0232 (2013.01); F25J 3/04115 (2013.01); F25J 2210/06 (2013.01); F25J 2230/20 (2013.01); F25J 2230/22 (2013.01); F25J 2230/30 (2013.01); F25J 2240/02 (2013.01); F25J 2290/60 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162373 A2 20011212; EP 1162373 A3 20050907; DE 10028863 A1 20011213; DE 10028863 B4 20090219

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080815

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060628

2006-05-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-09-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: E.ON RUHRGAS AG

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI