Global Patent Index - EP 1162375 A2

EP 1162375 A2 2001-12-12 - Actuation arrangement for swivelling parts of vehicles

Title (en)

Actuation arrangement for swivelling parts of vehicles

Title (de)

Betätigungsanordnung für schwenkbare Teile an Fahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Agencement d'actionnement pour des parties pivotables de véhicules

Publication

EP 1162375 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01890165 A

Priority

AT 9932000 A

Abstract (en)

Similarly working operating cylinder structures (OCS) (3) for both directions of swivel couple to a swivelling part. An operating fluid system (OFS) feeds each OCS. A control circuit affecting the OFS has sensors (16-18) and a control device (6). In the OFS there is a connector line (19) between operating areas (4,5) working in opposing directions and a blockable connector line between an operating area and a reservoir (11).

Abstract (de)

Betätigungsanordnung für um eine Drehachse (2) schwenkbare Teile an Fahrzeugen, insbesonders für Türen (1), mit zumindest einer mit dem schwenkbaren Teil gekoppelten gleichgängigen Arbeitszylinder-Anordnung (3) für beide Schwenkrichtungen, einem die Arbeitszylinder-Anordnung versorgenden Arbeitsfluid-System und einem auf das Arbeitsfluid-System einwirkenden Steuerkreis, der zumindest einen Sensor (16, 17, 18) und ein Steuergerät (6) aufweist, wobei im Arbeitsfluid-System zumindest eine Verbindungsleitung (19; 22, 21, 23) zwischen den in entgegengesetzter Richtung wirkenden Arbeiträumen (4, 5) der Arbeitszylinder-Anordnung (3) vorgesehen und je Arbeitsraum (4, 5) zusätzlich je eine sperrbare Verbindungsleitung zwischen dem Arbeitsraum und einem Reservoir (11) für das Arbeitsmedium geschaffen ist. Um mit einer einzigen, einfach aufgebauten und mit einer geringen Anzahl von Bauteilen auskommenden Konstruktion die größtmögliche Flexibilität und der größtmögliche Funktionsumfang zu erreichen, ist vorgesehen, dass in zumindest einer der Verbindungsleitungen zwischen den Arbeitsräumen (4, 5) der Arbeitszylinder-Anordnung (3) zumindest ein Proportional-Halteventil (21) mit über das Steuergerät (6) einstellbarem Öffnungsdruck eingesetzt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/10 (2006.01); F15B 20/00 (2006.01); E05F 15/02 (2006.01); E05F 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 20/004 (2013.01); F15B 11/003 (2013.01); F15B 13/10 (2013.01); E05F 15/50 (2013.01); E05F 15/53 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/546 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20561 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3051 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162375 A2 20011212; EP 1162375 A3 20040204; AT 409521 B 20020925; AT A9932000 A 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR SE

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040323

2004-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 15B 11/00 A

2002-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOERBIGER HYDRAULIK GMBH

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI