Global Patent Index - EP 1162383 A2

EP 1162383 A2 2001-12-12 - Compact braking assembly in an axle for an industrial vehicle

Title (en)

Compact braking assembly in an axle for an industrial vehicle

Title (de)

Kompakte, in der Achse eines Nutzfahrzeugs angebrachte Bremsanordnung

Title (fr)

Ensemble de frein compact disposé à l'intérieur d'un essieu de véhicule utilitaire

Publication

EP 1162383 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01202174 A

Priority

IT MI20001294 A

Abstract (en)

A compact braking assembly in an axle for an industrial vehicle comprising, within an internal body (10) which extends in an arm (18), supported in a rotatable manner (in 16, 17) a casing (14) of a differential (15) provided with a first set of disks (20, 21), with a second set of disks (46, 47) also positioned between the casing (14) and said arm (18) of the axle, with a piston (41) acting on the first set of disks (20, 21), operated by a fluid fed from a respective duct (43), which axially moves a ring (44), distributor of an operating force of the piston (41), in which the piston (41) successively positions the first set of disks (20, 21) in a pack acting as a differential lock, subsequently positioning the second set of disks (46, 47) in a pack acting as a service brake thanks to the presence of a pre-established preloaded elastic element (24). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16D 55/40; B60K 23/04; F16D 59/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 1/06 (2006.01); F16D 55/40 (2006.01); F16D 65/14 (2006.01); F16H 48/06 (2006.01); F16H 48/20 (2006.01); F16H 48/22 (2006.01); B60K 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 1/065 (2013.01); F16D 55/40 (2013.01); B60K 17/16 (2013.01); B60K 17/20 (2013.01); F16D 2121/02 (2013.01); F16D 2121/12 (2013.01); F16D 2123/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2001053730 A1 20011220; US 6506138 B2 20030114; AT 358788 T 20070415; CY 1107061 T1 20121024; DE 60127615 D1 20070516; DE 60127615 T2 20080103; DK 1162383 T3 20070813; EP 1162383 A2 20011212; EP 1162383 A3 20030319; EP 1162383 B1 20070404; ES 2284584 T3 20071116; IT 1317783 B1 20030715; IT MI20001294 A1 20011210; IT MI20001294 D0 20000609; PT 1162383 E 20070713

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150606

2016-02-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150606

2016-02-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151207

2016-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 358788 T

- Effective date: 20150606

2016-01-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-12-16 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20151207

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140607

2015-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-07-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150724

2015-05-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150105

2015-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140606

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-03-11 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20070401955

- Effective date: 20150105

2015-01-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140606

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-19 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-10-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130627

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-08-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20130702

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-08-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130627

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130627

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080107

2007-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2284584 T3

2007-10-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-13 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2007-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2007-07-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-07-23 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070401955

2007-07-13 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070703

2007-05-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60127615 P 20070516

2007-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-04-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030602

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16D 55/40 A

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16D 59/02 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60K 23/04 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60T 1/06 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16H 48/22 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60K 17/16 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI