Global Patent Index - EP 1162401 A2

EP 1162401 A2 2001-12-12 - Vehicle headlamp and lighting assembly comprising at least one such a headlamp

Title (en)

Vehicle headlamp and lighting assembly comprising at least one such a headlamp

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer für Fahrzeuge und Beleuchtungseinrichtung mit wenigstens einem solchen Scheinwerfer

Title (fr)

Projecteur pour véhicule et dispositif d'éclairage avec au moins un tel projecteur

Publication

EP 1162401 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112686 A

Priority

DE 10028456 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a light source that emits visible and non-visible light, a reflector of light from the source and a transparent plate in the light path from the reflector, whereby the headlamp emits a stopped light beam in the visible region and has an upper light-dark boundary. A deflector in at least part of the beam path deflects at least some of the light in the non-visible region so that it has a longer range than the visible light. The device has a light source (20) that emits light in the visible and non-visible wavelength ranges, a reflector (22) of light from the source and a transparent plate (28) in the light path from the reflector, whereby the headlamp emits a stopped light beam in the visible region and has an upper light-dark boundary. A deflector (40) is arranged in at least part of the beam path to deflect at least some of the light in the non-visible region so that it has a longer range than the visible light. A lighting device with at least one headlamp has a sensor and display associated with the non-visible light. An Independent claim is also included for a lighting device with at least one headlamp.

Abstract (de)

Der Scheinwerfer weist eine Lichtquelle (20) auf, die Licht in sichtbarem Wellenlängenbereich und Licht in nicht sichtbarem Wellenlängenbereich aussendet, einen Reflektor (22), durch den von der Lichtquelle (20) ausgesandtes Licht reflektiert wird und eine im Strahlengang des vom Reflektor (22) reflektierten Lichts angeordnete lichtdurchlässige Scheibe (28). Der Scheinwerfer (10) sendet ein abgeblendetes Lichtbündel in sichtbarem Wellenlängenbereich aus, das eine obere Helldunkelgrenze aufweist. In wenigstens einem Teil des Strahlengangs des von der Lichtquelle (20) ausgesandten Lichts ist eine Umlenkeinrichtung (40) angeordnet, durch die zumindest ein Teil des von der Lichtquelle (20) in nicht sichtbarem Wellenlängenbereich ausgesandten Lichts derart abgelenkt wird, daß dieses eine größere Reichweite besitzt als das vom Scheinwerfer (10) in sichtbarem Wellenlängenbereich ausgesandte abgeblendete Lichtbündel. Die Umlenkeinrichtung (40) weist eine ein Beugungsgitter bildende diffraktive Mikrostruktur (42) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10; B60Q 1/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/00 (2018.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 9/04 (2013.01); F21S 41/337 (2018.01); F21V 5/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19610904 A1 19970925 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162401 A2 20011212; EP 1162401 A3 20040324; EP 1162401 B1 20060726; DE 10028456 A1 20011213; DE 50110522 D1 20060907

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-28 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50110522

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F21S0008100000

- IPC: F21S0043000000

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150525

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150525

2014-10-09 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50110522

- Effective date: 20140819

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140516

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-19 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50110522

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110525

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061030

2006-10-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061026

2006-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110522 P 20060907

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-07-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050329

2004-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040924

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI